CT SB00075 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To permit persons sixteen years old to donate blood.
Title
An Act Permitting Persons Sixteen Years Old To Donate Blood.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Mitch Bolinsky [R] | Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R] | Rep. William Buckbee [R] |
Rep. Robin Green [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |