CT SB00070 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - House Calendar Number 714
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish the Connecticut Infrastructure Bank.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The Connecticut Infrastructure Bank.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 300 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 10625 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 301 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B,D (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 714
2019-06-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-06-03HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-03SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,D
2019-06-03SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D 10621
2019-06-03SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 10625
2019-06-03SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 10631
2019-05-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-28SenateNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-28SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-23SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-22SenateNo New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-05-22SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-22SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-22SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-15SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-05-15SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8724
2019-04-01SenateFile Number 255
2019-04-01SenateSenate Calendar Number 138
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-01SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-11SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Banking
2019-03-09SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00070&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00070-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00070-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00070-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00070-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00070-R04-SB.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00070-R00BA-CV15-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00070-R00BA-CV40-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00070-R00GAE-CV182-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00070-R00FIN-CV150-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00301-R00SB00070-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00300-R00SB00070-SV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback