CT SB00058 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - House Calendar Number 312
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - House Calendar Number 312
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the financial penalty on employers relating to certain unemployment compensation payments.
Title
An Act Concerning An Increase In Penalties Due To False Or Misleading Declarations, Statements Or Representations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 76 PASS (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 75 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 3469 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 75 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 3469 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 312 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 3469 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | File Number 28 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 68 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |