CT SB00058 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-01 - Public Hearing 02/09
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-01 - Public Hearing 02/09
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To promote conservation and a better environment by establishing a fee for plastic and paper bags and developing municipal recycling matching grants.
Title
An Act Establishing A Fee For The Use Of Plastic And Paper Bags At Grocery And Retail Establishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | |
2011-01-25 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |