CT SB00052 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce the number of uninsured children in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Task Force To Study Health Care For Uninsured Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2010-03-03 | File Number 5 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Calendar Number 39 | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-02-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-02-11 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |