CT SB00051 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To facilitate education and industry partnerships through data sharing and programming to develop and train workforces in high growth industries in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Funding And Expansion Of Certain Advanced Manufacturing Certificate Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | File Number 626 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 387 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |