CT SB00035 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's recommendations concerning notice of acquisitions, joint ventures and affiliations of group medical practices.
Title
An Act Concerning Notice Of Acquisitions, Joint Ventures, Affiliations Of Group Medical Practices And Hospital Admissions, Medical Foundations And Certificates Of Need.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 301 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 380 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 380 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Public Act 14-168 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Calendar Number 544 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5690 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-02 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-29 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4106 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | File Number 419 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 286 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |