CT SB00028 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the name of the manufacturer and the Internet web site and toll-free telephone number for the federal MedWatch safety information and adverse event reporting program on generic prescription drug container labels.
Title
An Act Concerning Manufacturer Names, Medwatch Reporting Information And Brand Names On Generic Drug Containers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 299 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 343 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 343 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-219 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 669 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-29 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8506 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-31 | Senate | File Number 329 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 232 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |