CT SB00025 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - File Number 656
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To restore the electoral privileges of convicted felons who are on parole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Restoring Electoral Privileges To Felony Convicts Who Are On Parole.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateFile Number 656
2019-04-15SenateSenate Calendar Number 315
2019-04-15SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-11SenatePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-02-06SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-06SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback