CT SB00017 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To include completion of the Free Application for Federal Student Aid, the application for institutional financial aid for undocumented students, or a waiver form as a condition to high school graduation.
Title
An Act Requiring The Completion Of The Free Application For Federal Student Aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |