CT SB00015 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Implementing The Governor's Budget Recommendations Concerning Higher Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Robert Duff [D] | Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] | Rep. Matthew Ritter [D] |
Sen. Derek Slap [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |