CT SB00012 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - File Number 671
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - File Number 671
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Adopting A Recommendation Of The Transportation Finance Group.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | File Number 671 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 431 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |