CT SB00010 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 590
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 590
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Authorizing And Adjusting Bonds Of The State.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | File Number 590 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 346 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/28 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |