CT SB00006 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Public Hearing 02/19
Pending: Joint Energy and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require Internet service providers to register and pay registration fees, to require the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to apply net neutrality principles to Internet service providers and enforce such principles with civil penalties and to prohibit Internet service providers from taking certain actions with respect to a consumer's personally identifying information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Net Neutrality Principles And Internet Privacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/19
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
2019-02-13SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-05SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback