CT SB00005 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - House Calendar Number 551
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - House Calendar Number 551
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make several changes to election laws designed to increase opportunities for absentee voting, safe and secure in-person voting and voter registration.
Title
An Act Concerning Increased Opportunities For Absentee Voting, Safe And Secure In-person Voting, Voter Registration And Certain Other Changes Regarding Election Administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 258 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 249 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 250 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 251 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 252 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 254 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 255 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 257 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 249 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 250 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 251 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 252 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 254 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 255 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 257 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | House Calendar Number 551 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule J 9249 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule I 9178 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 9177 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 9160 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 9200 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 9158 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 9151 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 9165 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9150 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9130 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | File Number 570 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 338 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |