CT SB00005 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - File Number 5
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - File Number 5
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorder associated with streptococcal infections.
Title
An Act Concerning Health Insurance Coverage For Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorder Associated With Streptococcal Infections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | File Number 5 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 41 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/10/14 5:00 PM |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |