CT SB00001 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To expand health services in schools.
Title
An Act Concerning Childhood Mental And Physical Health Services In Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 206 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 214 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 215 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 214 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 215 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act 22-80 |
2022-05-03 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-28 | House | House Calendar Number 498 |
2022-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-28 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 5797 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5715 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | File Number 641 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 456 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |