CT SB00001 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To establish a paid family and medical leave system in Connecticut.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Earned Family And Medical Leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 54 (Y: 0 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 55 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateMotion Failed (JF)
2018-04-11SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2018-04-04SenateFile Number 205
2018-04-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 154
2018-04-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-04SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-20SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-02SenatePublic Hearing 03/08
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2018-02-28SenateDrafted by Committee
2018-02-13SenateVote to Draft
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback