CT HR00032 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Memorandum Of Understanding Between The State Of Connecticut Office Of Early Childhood And The Connecticut State Employees Association (csea-seiu Local 2001).
Title
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Memorandum Of Understanding Between The State Of Connecticut Office Of Early Childhood And The Connecticut State Employees Association (csea-seiu Local 2001).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 297 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | House | Adopted, House |
2023-06-01 | House | File Number 850 |
2023-06-01 | House | House Calendar Number 619 |
2023-06-01 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-06-01 | House | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations |
2023-06-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 06/05/23 5:00 PM |
2023-05-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-30 | House | House Favorable |
2023-05-24 | House | Public Hearing 05/30 |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-22 | House | Filed with House Clerks 05/22 |