CT HR00030 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Memorandum Of Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut Judicial Branch And The Union Of Professional Judicial Employees, Aft/aft-ct, Concerning Information Technology And Other Employees.
Title
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Memorandum Of Agreement Between The State Of Connecticut Judicial Branch And The Union Of Professional Judicial Employees, Aft/aft-ct, Concerning Information Technology And Other Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 176 (Y: 88 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Adopted, House |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules Suspended |
2019-05-22 | House | File Number 976 |
2019-05-22 | House | House Calendar Number 632 |
2019-05-22 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/28/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-17 | House | House Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Public Hearing 05/17 |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-06 | House | Filed with House Clerks 05/03 |