CT HR00005 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Commemorating The Seventeenth Anniversary Of The Connecticut-taiwan Sister-state Relationship.
Title
Resolution Commemorating The Seventeenth Anniversary Of The Connecticut-taiwan Sister-state Relationship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 209 (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-30 | House | Adopted, House |
2016-04-06 | House | File Number 503 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 324 |
2016-04-06 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, House Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | House Favorable |
2016-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |