CT HJ00271 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Caroline Simmons Of Stamford To Be A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Caroline Simmons Of Stamford To Be A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 86 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | House | In Concurrence |
2023-04-27 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 301 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-05 | House | Adopted, House |
2023-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 158 |
2023-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-24 | House | Public Hearing 03/23 |