CT HJ00175 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Mary E. Sommer Of Stamford To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Mary E. Sommer Of Stamford To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 195 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 199 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 69 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 199 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 69 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-04-27 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 461 |
2016-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Adopted, House |
2016-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 415 |
2016-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-18 | House | Public Hearing 04/15 |