CT HJ00166 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Erin Benham Of Wallingford To Be Reappointed To The State Board Of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Erin Benham Of Wallingford To Be Reappointed To The State Board Of Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 227 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-05-28HouseAdopted, Senate
2019-05-20HouseSenate Calendar Number 525
2019-05-20HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-16HouseAdopted, House
2019-05-14HouseHouse Calendar Number 583
2019-05-14HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HousePublic Hearing 05/14

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback