CT HJ00149 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Claudia A. Baio, Esquire, Of Rocky Hill To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Claudia A. Baio, Esquire, Of Rocky Hill To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Sponsors
Rep. William Tong [D] | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Sen. John Kissel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 149 ADOPT (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 122 (Y: 77 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 122 (Y: 77 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 451 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-04-24 | House | House Calendar Number 424 |
2018-04-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-24 | House | Public Hearing 04/23 |