CT HJ00148 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Joseph M. Suggs, Jr. Of Bloomfield To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Commission On Human Rights And Opportunities.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Joseph M. Suggs, Jr. Of Bloomfield To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Commission On Human Rights And Opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 74 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 76 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 76 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 268 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2018-04-10 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 112 |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/29 |