CT HJ00135 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Vacating The Decision Of The Claims Commissioner To Dismiss The Claim Against The State Of Renei Stone And Remanding The Claim To The Claims Commissioner For A Hearing On The Merits.
Title
Resolution Vacating The Decision Of The Claims Commissioner To Dismiss The Claim Against The State Of Renei Stone And Remanding The Claim To The Claims Commissioner For A Hearing On The Merits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 375 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 379 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 74 (Y: 103 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 379 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 74 (Y: 103 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 469 |
2016-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Adopted, House |
2016-04-14 | House | File Number 623 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 389 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |