CT HJ00125 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Scott M. Jones, Esquire, Of Hamden To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Scott M. Jones, Esquire, Of Hamden To Be A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 233 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 31 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 31 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-04-29 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2022-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 348 |
2022-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-13 | House | Adopted, House |
2022-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 165 |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing 03/24 |