CT HJ00075 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Elease E. Wright Of Hartford To Be A Member Of The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Elease E. Wright Of Hartford To Be A Member Of The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 30 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-03-27 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate Calendar Number 60 |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Adopted, House |
2019-03-06 | House | House Calendar Number 27 |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |