CT HJ00072 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable J. Lawrence Price Of Avon To Be A Family Support Magistrate.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable J. Lawrence Price Of Avon To Be A Family Support Magistrate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 35 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 17 (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 17 (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-03-27 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2019-03-15 | House | Senate Calendar Number 58 |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Adopted, House |
2019-02-27 | House | House Calendar Number 18 |
2019-02-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |