CT HJ00068 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Granting The Claims Commissioner An Extension Of Time To Dispose Of Certain Claims.
Title
Resolution Granting The Claims Commissioner An Extension Of Time To Dispose Of Certain Claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 394 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 183 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 183 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-07 | House | Adopted, Senate as Amended by House A |
2021-06-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-26 | House | File Number 731 |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 481 |
2021-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | Adopted, House as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-24 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9101 |
2021-04-22 | House | File Number 584 |
2021-04-22 | House | House Calendar Number 411 |
2021-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |