CT HB07402 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Funding For Assistance To Persons Displaced By Hurricane Maria.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding For Assistance To Persons Displaced By Hurricane Maria.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] | Rep. Matthew Ritter [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Robert Duff [D] |
Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 74 PASS (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 23 (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 23 (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-05-02 | House | Public Act 19-1 |
2019-04-25 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Passed |
2019-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 376 |
2019-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | House Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Emergency Certification |