CT HB07396 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To repeal section 53a-70b of the general statutes concerning sexual assault in a spousal or cohabitating relationship and to make conforming changes.
Title
An Act Concerning Parity Between Sexual Assault In The Case Of A Spousal Or Cohabitating Relationship And Other Crimes Of Sexual Assault And Concerning The Investigation Of A Family Violence Crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 367 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 179 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 179 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-25 | House | Public Act 19-189 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-24 | House | File Number 997 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Calendar Number 603 |
2019-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-22 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9337 |
2019-04-30 | House | File Number 851 |
2019-04-30 | House | House Calendar Number 534 |
2019-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-28 | House | Public Hearing 04/01 |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |