CT HB07255 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit public institutions of higher education from placing provisions in collective bargaining agreements that would prevent an employee from seeking a civil or administrative cause of action or from seeking arbitration after the commencement of a civil or administrative proceeding.
Title
An Act Concerning Public Institutions Of Higher Education And Collective Bargaining Agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | House | File Number 251 |
2019-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 169 |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |