CT HB07255 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Senate Calendar Number 572
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Senate Calendar Number 572
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force to conduct a feasibility study regarding the creation of a state special education predictable cost cooperative.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Conduct A Feasibility Study Regarding The Creation Of A Special Education Predictable Cost Cooperative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 293 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 138 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 294 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 294 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 572 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2017-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7913 |
2017-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | House | File Number 553 |
2017-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 368 |
2017-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-10 | House | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |