CT HB07241 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 906
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 906
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor and technical changes to the Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
An Act Concerning Minor And Technical Changes To The Workers' Compensation Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 112 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | File Number 906 |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 498 |
2019-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-14 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8044 |
2019-04-02 | House | File Number 294 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 202 |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |