CT HB07226 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 940
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a pilot program to provide incentives for teachers to live in certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Affordable Housing For Educators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 141 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseFile Number 940
2019-05-20HouseSenate Calendar Number 534
2019-05-20HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-16HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-16HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8750
2019-03-26HouseFile Number 151
2019-03-26HouseHouse Calendar Number 115
2019-03-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-26HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Housing

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback