CT HB07192 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal And Regional Opportunities And Efficiencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] | Rep. Matthew Ritter [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Robert Duff [D] |
Rep. Kara Rochelle [D] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Antonio Felipe [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 348 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 384 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 384 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Public Act 19-193 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 692 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10979 |
2019-05-08 | House | File Number 861 |
2019-05-08 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-08 | House | New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 688 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 424 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |