CT HB07162 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish an open educational resource program to help lower the cost of textbooks and course materials at institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The Connecticut Open Educational Resource Coordinating Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-03HouseFile Number 345
2019-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 223
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback