CT HB07105 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Senate Calendar Number 384
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To promote public safety and compliance with the ban of certain motor vehicles on parkways in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Penalty For Commercial Vehicles On State Parkways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 31 (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 384
2019-04-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 284
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 190
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-11HousePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback