CT HB07089 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide a means of additional funding for advanced manufacturing certificate programs that have a high graduate employment rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Funding And Expansion Of Certain Advanced Manufacturing Certificate Programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-03-06HouseFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-03-06HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-28HouseJoint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback