CT HB07070 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 936
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 936
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit deceptive advertising practices by limited services pregnancy centers.
Title
An Act Concerning Deceptive Advertising Practices Of Limited Services Pregnancy Centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 138 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 60 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 139 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 59 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 140 AS AMENDED (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 8 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 139 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 59 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 140 AS AMENDED (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 8 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | File Number 936 |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Calendar Number 542 |
2019-05-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-16 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8932 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8937 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8919 |
2019-04-18 | House | File Number 753 |
2019-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 451 |
2019-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |