CT HB07061 | 2015 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2017, And Making Appropriations Therefor, And Other Provisions Related To Revenue, Deficiency Appropriations And Tax Fairness And Economic Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2017, And Making Appropriations Therefor, And Other Provisions Related To Revenue, Deficiency Appropriations And Tax Fairness And Economic Development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 477 PASS EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 476 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 9412 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 475 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 9372 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 357 AS AMENDED (Y: 72 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 356 HOUSE AMD H (Y: 57 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 355 HOUSE AMD G (Y: 57 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 354 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 57 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 353 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 57 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 352 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 57 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 351 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 57 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 350 AS AMENDED HOUSE AMD B (Y: 58 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 349 EMERGENCY CERTIFI HOUSE AMD A (Y: 71 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-30HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-06-26HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2015-06-26HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2015-06-17HousePublic Act 15-244
2015-06-17HousePublic Act 15-244
2015-06-03HouseIn Concurrence
2015-06-03HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2015-06-03HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9412
2015-06-03HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 9372
2015-06-03HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2015-06-02HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2015-06-02HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2015-06-02HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule H 9362
2015-06-02HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule G 9329
2015-06-02HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 9356
2015-06-02HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 9355
2015-06-02HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 9360
2015-06-02HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 9328
2015-06-02HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 9331
2015-06-02HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9305
2015-06-02HouseEmergency Certification

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB07061&which_year=2015
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/H/2015HB-07061-R00-HB.htm
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/ACT/PA/2015PA-00244-R00HB-07061-PA.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/H/2015HV-00349-R00HB07061-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/H/2015HV-00350-R00HB07061-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/H/2015HV-00351-R00HB07061-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/H/2015HV-00352-R00HB07061-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/H/2015HV-00353-R00HB07061-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/H/2015HV-00354-R00HB07061-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/H/2015HV-00355-R00HB07061-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/H/2015HV-00356-R00HB07061-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/H/2015HV-00357-R00HB07061-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/S/2015SV-00475-R00HB07061-SV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/S/2015SV-00476-R00HB07061-SV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/VOTE/S/2015SV-00477-R00HB07061-SV.htm

Bill Comments

feedback