CT HB07055 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 413
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 413
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To create a competitive bidding process for a resort-casino facility.
Title
An Act Creating A Competitive Bidding Process For A Resort-casino Facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 413 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 265 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2019-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |