CT HB07004 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - File Number 857
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - File Number 857
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the task force to study service of restraining orders.
Title
An Act Concerning Implementation Of The Recommendations Of The Task Force To Study Service Of Restraining Orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | House | File Number 857 |
2015-05-19 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-19 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-05-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-13 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-23 | House | File Number 732 |
2015-04-23 | House | House Calendar Number 464 |
2015-04-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-12 | House | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |