CT HB07001 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - File Number 319
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - File Number 319
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To add two additional student trustees to the Board of Trustees for The University of Connecticut.
Title
An Act Concerning Student Membership On The Board Of Trustees For The University Of Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | File Number 319 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 234 |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-03 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |