CT HB06969 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - File Number 387
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - File Number 387
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require a person who installs an above-ground swimming pool to hold a swimming pool builder's license.
Title
An Act Concerning Swimming Pool Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | File Number 387 |
2015-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 243 |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |