CT HB06956 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - File Number 424
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - File Number 424
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require that a child under eight years of age but not under five years of age be transported in a child restraint system with a five-point harness or a booster seat, a child under five years of age but not under two years of age be transported in a child restraint system with a five-point harness, a child under two years of age be transported in a rear-facing child restraint system and to prohibit the use of rear-facing child restraint systems in the front seat of vehicles with functional side passenger air bags.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Child Restraint Systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | File Number 424 |
2017-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 297 |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-02 | House | Public Hearing 02/06 |
2017-01-30 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |