CT HB06947 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure uniform and adequate reimbursement for private providers of health and human services who enter into contracts with state agencies.
Title
An Act Concerning State Contracts For Human Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2015-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |