CT HB06929 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To protect certain workers and first responders by allowing them to file workers' compensation claims for injuries sustained while traveling to and from work.
Title
An Act Allowing Certain State And Municipal Workers And First Responders To File Workers' Compensation Claims For Injuries Sustained While Traveling To And From Work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 409 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 261 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-13 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |